Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Phan Van Ha

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhon

Titular Bishop of Acci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1922BornGothi
17 May 195532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Quy Nhon, Viet Nam
30 Mar 197653.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhon, Viet Nam
30 Mar 197653.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acci
30 Mar 197653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acci
6 Oct 198765.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhon, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Phan Van Ha:
Bishop Joseph Phan Van Ha (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhon

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013