Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Audemar

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1757BornAuzet, France
1817¹59.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
1817¹59.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
29 Mar 181860.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
8 Aug 182164.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Audemar
Bishop Jean-Joseph Audemar (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 59
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016