Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie-Henri-Agathon Pellerin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1813Born
17 Dec 183623.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Mar 184431.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam
11 Mar 184431.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
4 Oct 184633.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
27 Aug 185037.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
27 Aug 185239.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
13 Sep 186249.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Henri-Agathon Pellerin
Bishop François-Marie-Henri-Agathon Pellerin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimper, France

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018