Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Galibert, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1845Born
1866¹20.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Jun 186823.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 May 187934.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam
23 May 187934.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
26 Oct 187934.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
24 Apr 188338.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Galibert
Bishop Louis-Marie Galibert M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnglès-du-Tarn, France

  • a priest for 14.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast