Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Macau

Dioecesis Macaonensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 January 1576
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 19 (7 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.macaudiocese.org.mo/
  • Mailing Address: Paco Episcopal, C.P. 324, Largo da Se, Macau
  • Telephone: 309.954
  • Fax: 309.861

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 January 1576ErectedDiocese of Malacca Diocese of Macau (erected)
1588Territory LostDiocese of Macau Diocese of Funay (Funai) (erected)
1659Territory LostDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina} (erected)
1659Territory LostDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Tonking (erected)
30 September 1660Territory LostDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] (erected)
10 April 1690Territory LostDiocese of Macau Diocese of Peking [Beijing] (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195023,0004,800,000.5%463076302477028ap1951
197026,000169,29915.4%4435793295320921ap1971
197839,010300,63613.0%383573534532018ap1981
199021,539456,0004.7%383472299471588ap1991
199928,015430,5006.5%4142833374917911ap2000
200029,139438,0006.7%424587334561766ap2001
200129,850438,0006.8%274572414621768ap2002
200219,903435,0004.6%274370284611838ap2003
200318,122441,6004.1%245276238641718ap2004
200418,122446,0004.1%245276238621838ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 28 May 2013