Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Lambert de la Motte, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Berytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1624BornLisieux, France
27 Dec 165531.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jul 165834.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
29 Jul 165834.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
11 Jun 166036.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berytus
1669¹44.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
15 Jun 167955.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Lambert de la Motte:
Bishop Pierre Lambert de la Motte M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015