Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Soạn

Bishop Emeritus of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1936 Born
21 Dec 196832.0Ordained PriestPriest of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
3 Jun 199962.4AppointedBishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
12 Aug 199962.6Ordained BishopBishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
30 Jun 201275.5RetiredBishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyễn Soạn
Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Soạn (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoi Thi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,594
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast