Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph-Georges Pigneau de Béhaine, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1741Born
1765¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Sep 177129.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
24 Sep 177129.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
24 Feb 177432.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
9 Oct 179957.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph-Georges Pigneau de Béhaine
Bishop Pierre-Joseph-Georges Pigneau de Béhaine M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrigny-en-Thiérache, France

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018