Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Marchand, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Timmins, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1937BornLafontaine
17 Mar 196224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
31 May 199356.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
31 May 199356.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamata
20 Aug 199356.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamata
8 Mar 199961.9AppointedBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada
17 May 199962.1InstalledBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada
24 Jul 201174.3DiedBishop of Timmins, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul Marchand:
Bishop Paul Marchand S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Timmins

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,125
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013