Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Hugues Gauthier

Deceased

Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1843BornAlexandria
28 Aug 186723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
29 Jul 189854.7AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
18 Oct 189854.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
6 Sep 191066.8AppointedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
19 Jan 192278.2DiedArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles-Hugues Gauthier:
Archbishop Charles-Hugues Gauthier (born , died ) Archbishop of Ottawa

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013