Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Joseph Colli

Bishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1949 BornSaint Catharines
21 Jun 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
19 Dec 199445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
19 Dec 199445.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
22 Feb 199545.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
2 Feb 199949.6AppointedBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada
25 Mar 199949.8InstalledBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Frederick Joseph Colli:
Bishop Frederick Joseph Colli (born ) Bishop of Thunder Bay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thunder Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013