Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Côté, S.M.M.

Bishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1945 Born
19 Dec 197025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
3 Feb 199549.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea
3 Feb 199549.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
23 Apr 199549.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
2 Jan 199953.1AppointedBishop of Daru-Kiunga, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Gilles Côté
Bishop Gilles Côté S.M.M. (born ) Bishop of Daru-Kiunga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVanier, Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daru-Kiunga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,543

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast