Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Gratton

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1924Born
27 Apr 195227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
10 May 197853.4AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
29 Jun 197853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
8 Sep 200176.7RetiredBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
14 Apr 201186.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean Gratton
Bishop Jean Gratton (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWendover

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018