Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel André J. Gervais

Archbishop Emeritus of Ottawa, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1931 BornElie
31 May 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 198048.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
19 Apr 198048.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
11 Jun 198048.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
3 May 198553.6AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
17 Jun 198553.7InstalledBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
13 May 198957.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
27 Sep 198958.0SucceededArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
14 May 200775.6RetiredArchbishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Marcel André J. Gervais:
Archbishop Marcel André J. Gervais (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ottawa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ottawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014