Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Laurent Jubinville, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of San Pedro, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1960 Born
Jan 1988³27.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Sep 198828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Nov 201353.2AppointedBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
21 Dec 201353.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Laurent Jubinville
Bishop Pierre Laurent Jubinville C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of San Pedro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pedro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c1: CB, 25 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 20 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 165
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,997

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast