Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Timmins

Dioecesis Timminsensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Serge Patrick Poitras, Bishop
  • Jacques Landriault, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 10 December 1938
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ottawa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 26,200 (10,119 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Tim
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioctims.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 65 Ave. Jubilee Est, Timmins, Ont. P4N 5W4, Canada
  • Telephone: (705)267-6224
  • Fax: 267-6226

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Temiskaming
21 September 1908ErectedDiocese of Pembroke Vicariate Apostolic of Temiskaming (erected)
Diocese of Haileybury
31 December 1915ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Temiskaming Diocese of Haileybury (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
18 April 1919Territory LostDiocese of Haileybury Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord) (erected)
3 December 1938Territory LostDiocese of Haileybury Diocese of Amos (erected)
3 December 1938Territory LostDiocese of Haileybury
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Ontario (Ontario-Nord)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baie de James {James Bay} (erected)
Diocese of Timmins
10 December 1938Name ChangedDiocese of Haileybury Diocese of Timmins
29 November 1973Territory LostDiocese of Timmins Diocese of Rouyn-Noranda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Timmins
194985,522140,00061.1%94221167374440272ap1951
1966105,000159,00066.0%1005615667313652586ap1967
197095,197143,18766.5%835413769410143971ap1971
197659,770103,62057.7%3317501,1954112437ap1977
198060,400112,80053.5%2918471,2853710337ap1981
199059,600123,00048.5%337401,4907147534ap1991
199955,20098,00056.3%265311,7807103831ap2000
200055,20098,00056.3%224262,123793731ap2001
200155,20098,00056.3%213242,300583531ap2002
200255,20098,00056.3%213242,300783331ap2003
200355,20098,00056.3%194232,400692831ap2004
200448,90092,50052.9%174212,328683030ap2005
201048,61588,22055.1%163192,558681024ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013