Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Brunet

Deceased

Bishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1868Born
23 Sep 189324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
6 Aug 191344.6AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
28 Oct 191344.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
7 Jan 192253.1DiedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Brunet
Bishop François-Xavier Brunet (born , died ) Bishop of Mont-Laurier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-André-d'Argenteuil

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018