Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Luanda

Archidioecesis Luandensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Damião António Franklin, Archbishop
  • Zeferino Zeca Martins, S.V.D., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alexandre do Nascimento, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Anastácio Kahango, O.F.M. Cap., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 September 1940
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 1,074 (414 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Largo do Palacio 9, C.P. 87, 1230-C Luanda, Angola
  • Telephone: (02)331.481
  • Fax: 334.433

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Angola e Congo
1596ErectedDiocese of Angola e Congo (erected)
4 September 1940Territory LostDiocese of Angola e Congo Diocese of Nova Lisboa (erected)
4 September 1940Territory LostDiocese of Angola e Congo Diocese of Silva Porto (erected)
Archdiocese of Luanda
4 September 1940ElevatedDiocese of Angola e Congo Archdiocese of Luanda
25 November 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda
Diocese of Silva Porto
Diocese of Malanje (erected)
14 March 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Carmona e São Salvador (erected)
10 August 1975Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Ngunza (erected)
2 July 1984Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Cabinda (erected)
26 March 1990Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Ndalatando (erected)
6 June 2007Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Viana (erected)
6 June 2007Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Caxito (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Luanda
1949223,0001,509,97914.8%2662882,534726751ap1951
1970720,0001,400,00051.4%39631027,0589519026ap1971
1980623,000923,00067.5%8435112,2155813134ap1981
19901,218,0002,214,00055.0%14748813,84010724729ap1991
19992,520,1604,420,05057.0%138910224,70730947329ap2000
20002,535,0004,500,00056.3%1711713418,91732949931ap2001
20012,855,0004,750,00060.1%1711813521,148132351632ap2002
20023,011,0004,890,00061.6%2311113422,470135252732ap2003
20033,400,0005,050,00067.3%2911414323,776141854933ap2004
20043,055,0004,843,00063.1%2712014720,782128954332ap2005
20072,341,0003,184,68173.5%10607033,44219bul6Jun2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013