Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio do Espirito Santo, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
14 Nov 167240.8AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
8 Jan 167341.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
12 Jan 167442.0DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio do Espirito Santo
Bishop Antonio do Espirito Santo O.C.D. (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemor o Velho, Portugal

  • a bishop for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,785
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast