Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sumbe

Dioecesis Sumbensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luzizila Kiala, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 October 2006
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Luanda
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bispado, C.P. 277, Rua do Soba Ulundo, Sumbe, Kwanza Sul, Angola
  • Telephone: 236.230.120
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ngunza
10 August 1975ErectedArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Ngunza (erected)
Diocese of Novo Redondo
3 February 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Ngunza Diocese of Novo Redondo
Diocese of Sumbe
22 October 2006Name ChangedDiocese of Novo Redondo Diocese of Sumbe

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Novo Redondo
1980171,000676,00025.3%2111313,153123812ap1981
1990343,000853,00040.2%2141621,437185212ap1991
1999306,9221,170,52626.2%13152810,961196912ap2000
2000310,3841,173,98826.4%2012329,699146313ap2001
2001314,7081,178,31226.7%17122910,852145913ap2002
2002319,7321,181,04927.1%16122811,419164314ap2003
2003325,8811,181,12527.6%1592413,578124215ap2004
2004329,6141,233,55126.7%1792612,677114314ap2005
Diocese of Sumbe
2010374,2341,310,00028.6%299389,84895517ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 28 Aug 2013