Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexandre Cardinal do Nascimento

Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco in Agro Laurentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1925 BornMalanje
20 Dec 195227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Malanje, Angola
10 Aug 197550.4AppointedBishop of Malanje, Angola
31 Aug 197550.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malanje, Angola
3 Feb 197751.9AppointedArchbishop of Lubango, Angola
2 Feb 198357.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198357.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco in Agro Laurentino
16 Feb 198661.0AppointedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
23 Jan 200175.9RetiredArchbishop of Luanda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Alexandre do Nascimento:
Alexandre Cardinal do Nascimento (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Luanda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014