Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe

Dioecesis Sancti Thomae in Insula



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 November 1534
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: São Tomé and Príncipe
  • Square Kilometers: 1,001 (386 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Centro Diocesano, C.P. 104, Rua P. Pinto da Rocha 1, Sao Tome, Sao Tome e Principe
  • Telephone: (012)223.455
  • Fax: 227.348

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 November 1534ErectedArchdiocese of Funchal Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe (erected)
21 January 1612Territory LostDiocese of São Tomé e Príncipe Apostolic Administration of Mozambico (erected)
22 January 1842Territory LostDiocese of Funchal
Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe
Prefecture Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195036,14960,54059.7%1894,016810ap1951
196959,57263,48593.8%15153,97117166ap1971
197870,00083,00084.3%16710,00071512ap1981
198896,500104,50092.3%8812,062152112ap1991
1999104,753127,50082.2%101010,475143612ap2000
2000107,147129,27282.9%29119,740183912ap2001
2001109,300131,42583.2%210129,108194012ap2002
2002117,889133,42588.4%8814,736153812ap2003
2003118,800135,00088.0%281011,880153812ap2004
2004121,931138,00088.4%27913,547153612ap2005
2008115,000160,00071.9%77148,214143412ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013