Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Carlos Kiaziku, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Mbanza Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1957 BornKimacaka-Bamba
28 Sep 197518.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jun 198527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Jan 200951.5AppointedBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola
8 Mar 200951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Vicente Carlos Kiaziku:
Bishop Vicente Carlos Kiaziku O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Mbanza Congo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbanza Congo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,063

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013