Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kwito-Bié

Dioecesis Kvitobiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Nambi, Bishop
  • Pedro Luís António, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 May 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Huambo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 71,000 (27,423 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 16, Kuito-Bie, Angola
  • Telephone: 70.097
  • Fax: 70.534

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Silva Porto
4 September 1940ErectedDiocese of Angola e Congo Diocese of Silva Porto (erected)
25 November 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Luanda
Diocese of Silva Porto
Diocese of Malanje (erected)
1 July 1963Territory LostDiocese of Silva Porto Diocese of Luso (erected)
Diocese of Kwito-Bié
16 May 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Silva Porto Diocese of Kwito-Bié

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Silva Porto
195063,536943,5296.7%46461,38142152ap1951
1969243,743600,00040.6%1244564,352668226ap1971
Diocese of Kwito-Bié
1980329,000723,00045.5%36936,55581522ap1981
1990326,300767,00042.5%15654,38392624ap1991
1999415,655981,17942.4%1141527,710123410ap2000
2000420,344985,12042.7%1021235,02853011ap2001
2001426,774995,99142.8%1321528,45153711ap2002
2002432,6261,000,13143.3%1341725,44873711ap2003
2003440,6271,001,91444.0%1351824,479103511ap2004
2004453,3471,016,68844.6%1351825,18594111ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 17 Jan 2012