Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Damião António Franklin

Deceased

Archbishop of Luanda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1950Born
28 Jun 197827.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 199241.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
29 May 199241.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Falerone
12 Jul 199241.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Falerone
23 Jan 200150.4AppointedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
28 Apr 201463.7DiedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Damião António Franklin
Archbishop Damião António Franklin (born , died ) Archbishop of Luanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabinda

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,787
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018