Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filomeno do Nascimento Vieira Dias

Archbishop of Luanda, Angola

Apostolic Administrator of Cabinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1958 Born
30 Oct 198325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Luanda, Angola
4 Oct 200345.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
4 Oct 200345.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
11 Jan 200445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
11 Feb 200546.8AppointedBishop of Cabinda, Angola
8 Dec 201456.6AppointedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
8 Dec 201456.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cabinda, Angola
24 Jan 201556.7InstalledArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
7 Oct 201860.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cabinda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Filomeno do Nascimento Vieira Dias
Archbishop Filomeno do Nascimento Vieira Dias (born ) Archbishop of Luanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuanda, Archdiocese of Luanda
Ordained BishopPavilhão Desportivo da Cidadela, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Luanda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,507
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 20 Jan 2015
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jul 2018

Quantcast