Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saurimo

Archidioecesis Saurimoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Josť Manuel Imbamba, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 April 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 77,600 (29,973 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bispado, Rua do Cemiterio, C.P. 52, Saurimo [Lunda], Angola
  • Telephone: 253.250.575
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Henrique de Carvalho
10 August 1975ErectedDiocese of Henrique de Carvalho (erected)
Diocese of Saurimo
16 May 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Henrique de Carvalho Diocese of Saurimo
9 November 2001Territory LostDiocese of Saurimo Diocese of Dundo (erected)
Archdiocese of Saurimo
12 April 2011ElevatedDiocese of Saurimo Archdiocese of Saurimo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saurimo
198041,000307,50013.3%885,1259157ap1981
199046,000369,00012.5%4485,75061810ap1991
199978,300710,00011.0%65117,1185243ap2000
200080,500740,00010.9%64108,0504223ap2001
200140,000400,00010.0%6175,7145132ap2002
200235,000270,00013.0%6175,0005142ap2003
200348,000310,00015.5%6395,3334142ap2004
200456,000380,00014.7%6396,2224163ap2005
201061,700410,00015.0%99183,42713225ap2011
Archdiocese of Saurimo

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013