Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maurício Agostinho Camuto, C.S.Sp.

Bishop-Elect of Caxito, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1963 Born
5 Sep 198723.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
28 Jul 199127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
15 Jun 202056.4AppointedBishop of Caxito, Angola
16 Aug 202056.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caxito, Angola

MicroData Summary for Maurício Agostinho Camuto
Father Maurício Agostinho Camuto C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Caxito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColungo Alto, Archdiocese of Luanda
Ordained BishopEstadio Municipal de Dande, Caxito, Diocese of Caxito

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Caxito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 24 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 Jun 2020

Quantcast