Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo André Muaca

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1924Born
18 Jan 195328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Luanda, Angola
4 Mar 197045.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
4 Mar 197045.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
31 May 197045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
25 Sep 197348.9AppointedBishop of Malanje, Angola
10 Aug 197550.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Luanda, Angola
10 Aug 197550.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tagarbala
19 Dec 197551.1SucceededArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
31 Aug 198560.8ResignedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
26 Jan 200277.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Eduardo André Muaca
Archbishop Eduardo André Muaca (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucula

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jun 2018

Quantcast