Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Barbosa Leão

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1860BornParada Thodea
2 Aug 188524.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Porto, Portugal
1 Aug 188625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
2 Mar 190645.4SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
2 May 190645.5ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
26 Aug 190645.9Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
19 Dec 190747.2AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
16 Jul 191958.7AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
8 Sep 191958.9InstalledBishop of Porto, Portugal
21 Jun 192968.7DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Barbosa Leão:
Bishop António Barbosa Leão (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,796
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013