Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Brennwald, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Troja


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1491AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
16 May 1491AppointedTitular Bishop of Troja
29 May 1491Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troja
12 Dec 1500AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
5 Feb 1517DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Brennwald
Bishop Balthasar Brennwald O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalenstadt

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 257
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,418
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast