Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Maria Ferdinand von Bissingen-Nieppenburg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Iasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1750³Born
26 Apr 177827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
23 Dec 180151.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
23 Dec 180151.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
28 Mar 180251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
24 Apr 181362.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Mar 182069.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernst Maria Ferdinand von Bissingen-Nieppenburg
Bishop Ernst Maria Ferdinand von Bissingen-Nieppenburg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonstanz

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast