Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignaz Heinrich von Wessenberg

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

Priest of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1774BornDresden
Sep 181237.8Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
27 Feb 181742.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
17 Jun 182449.6IncardinatedPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
17 Jun 182449.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Aug 186085.8DiedPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Heinrich von Wessenberg:
Priest Ignaz Heinrich von Wessenberg (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 47.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013