Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Hewen

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398BornSchwarzenbach
4 Aug 143638.6SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
19 Sep 143638.7ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
23 Dec 143639.0Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
8 Mar 144143.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chur, Switzerland
10 May 145658.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Chur, Switzerland
1 Sep 146264.7DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Hewen:
Bishop Heinrich von Hewen (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013