Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Fugger von Kirchberg Weissen Horn

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1567BornAugsburg
159224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
27 Jan 160436.2SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
5 May 160436.5ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
25 Jul 160436.7Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
24 Jan 162658.2DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob Fugger von Kirchberg Weissen Horn:
Bishop Jakob Fugger von Kirchberg Weissen Horn (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015