Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard von Randeck

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1398AppointedBishop of Minden, Germany
10 Dec 1398AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
28 Dec 1406DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Marquard von Randeck
Bishop Marquard von Randeck (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342, and Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast