Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Damian Hugo Philipp Cardinal von Schönborn Bushein

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1676BornMainz
30 Jan 171336.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 May 171538.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jul 171639.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
5 Oct 171640.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
30 Nov 171943.1SucceededBishop of Speyer, Germany
15 Aug 172043.9Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
24 Feb 172144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
16 Jun 172144.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
10 Sep 172144.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
18 May 172245.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Mar 172346.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Jul 174063.8SucceededBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
19 Aug 174366.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Damian Hugo Philipp von Schönborn Bushein:
Damian Hugo Philipp Cardinal von Schönborn Bushein (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • a cardinal for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015