Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes von Weeze

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1488¹Born
1522²34.0AppointedArchbishop of Lund, Sweden
5 Dec 153042.9AppointedBishop of Roskilde (Roeskilde), Denmark
14 Jul 153850.5SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
11 Jan 154052.0ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
1541²53.0Ordained PriestPriest
May 1542³54.3Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
13 Jun 154860.4DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Weeze (VIAF: 30379078)
Bishop Johannes von Weeze (born 1488, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZevenaar

  • a priest for 7.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,627
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230, and Page 286
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast