Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Galura

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1764BornHerbholzheim
20 Jul 178823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
181853.4IncardinatedPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 Dec 181955.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 Dec 181955.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
30 Jan 182055.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
10 Apr 182964.6SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
28 Sep 182965.1ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Dec 182965.3InstalledBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 May 185691.7DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Galura:
Bishop Bernhard Galura (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 78, and Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013