Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Krafft

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471¹Born
6 Apr 149322.2Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
27 Jan 150130.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Jan 150130.0SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Jan 150130.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
1 Feb 150130.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Feb 150130.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
14 Feb 150130.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
16 Mar 153059.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Krafft (VIAF: 263681303)
Bishop Peter Krafft (born 1471, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlaubeuren
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast