Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Eliner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517¹BornBregenz
154225.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 155134.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
19 Jan 155134.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
10 May 155134.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
14 Apr 157457.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Eliner:
Bishop Jakob Eliner (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Dec 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 119
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013