Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Wurer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
154734.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 157461.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
28 Jul 157461.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
26 Sep 157461.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
159885.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Feb 160693.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Wurer (VIAF: 69862270)
Bishop Balthasar Wurer (born 1513, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchömberg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Constance, Diocese of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,574, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast