Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ludwig von Freiburg

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442Born
2 Sep 147432.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Sep 147432.7SucceededBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
1 Aug 1479³37.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
6 Nov 148038.8DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwig von Freiburg (VIAF: 220984136)
Father Ludwig von Freiburg (born 1442, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiberach

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast