Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernhard Boll, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1756BornStuttgart
13 Nov 177620.4ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
23 Sep 178024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
180245.6IncardinatedPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
182164.6IncardinatedPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Jun 182468.0SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 May 182771.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Oct 182771.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
6 Mar 183679.7DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Boll:
Archbishop Bernhard Boll O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013