Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz von Schenk von Stauffenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1658BornLautlingen
21 Jul 170446.4SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
11 Nov 170446.7Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
26 Jan 170546.9ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
26 Apr 170547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Aug 171456.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Sep 171456.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Jan 173778.9SucceededBishop of Augsburg, Germany
12 Jun 174082.3DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz von Schenk von Stauffenberg:
Bishop Johann Franz von Schenk von Stauffenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013