Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Truchseß von Waldburg-Wolfegg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1598BornWaldsee
23 Dec 162729.7SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
28 Jun 162830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Jul 162830.3ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
4 Feb 162930.8Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Dec 164446.7DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Truchseß von Waldburg-Wolfegg:
Bishop Johannes Truchseß von Waldburg-Wolfegg (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 16.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015