Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)

Ernakulamensis-Angamaliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Raphael Thattil, Archbishop
  • Bosco Puthur, Apostolic Administrator
  • Thomas Chakiath, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Antony Kariyil, C.M.I., Archiepiscopal Vicar Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar)
28 July 1896ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)
Vicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Archeparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar)
21 December 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) Archeparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar)
29 July 1956Territory LostArcheparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) Diocese of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
16 December 1992Territory LostArcheparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)
16 December 1992Name ChangedArcheparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archeparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar)
1950265,8791,375,00019.3%2032031,309105838127ap1951
1970273,7721,210,00022.6%2151253408051722,144110ap1971
1980323,8502591764357443323,258272ap1981
1990389,0503,898,43210.0%2762184947874283,271313ap1991
Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)
1999450,1004,350,00010.3%3142505647985004,080312ap2000
2000455,2004,370,00010.4%3012605618115164,200325ap2001
2001468,9004,385,00010.7%3343006347395474,280328ap2002
2002481,0004,400,00010.9%3423106527375624,380332ap2003
2003495,0004,500,00011.0%3533306837245984,450337ap2004
2004504,0004,650,00010.8%3623457077125854,550346ap2005
2006509,0004,660,00010.9%3573657227046324,900346ap2007
2009513,0004,678,00011.0%3743657396946604,975347ap2010
2013565,0004,937,00011.4%3923857777276995,092349ap2014
2016610,0004,785,00012.7%3823827647987115,270349ap2017
2019640,1204,880,30013.1%3903957858155423,972214ap2020
2021655,0004,983,22213.1%4103958058135514,235235ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archeparchy of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 16, Page 257, to Page 262
  • Archeparchy of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 85, Page 398, and Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024