Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Chennoth

Apostolic Nuncio to Japan

Titular Archbishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1943 BornKockamangalam, India
4 May 196925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 Aug 199955.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Milevum
24 Aug 199955.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
24 Aug 199955.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
30 Oct 199956.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Milevum
15 Jun 200561.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania
15 Aug 201167.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Japan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chennoth:
Archbishop Joseph Chennoth (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Japan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Japan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,643
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015