Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Vadakel, C.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1943 Born
16 May 196420.6ProfessedMember of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
19 Dec 197532.2Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
14 Aug 200965.9AppointedBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Oct 200966.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
30 Aug 201975.9RetiredBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for John Vadakel
Bishop John Vadakel C.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bijnor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeslehem
Ordained BishopGrounds Of, Saint Joseph’s School, Kotdwar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast