Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Thattil

Bishop of Shamshabad (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1956 Born
21 Dec 198024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Jan 201053.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Jan 201053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Buruni
10 Apr 201053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buruni
10 Oct 201761.4AppointedBishop of Shamshabad (Syro-Malabar), India
7 Jan 201861.7InstalledBishop of Shamshabad (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Raphael Thattil
Bishop Raphael Thattil (born ) Bishop of Shamshabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrichur, Eparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Lourdes, Cathedral, Trichur, Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Shamshabad (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,619
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2017
  • i: CB, 24 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Nov 2017